(7) Multiply and write the answer in the simplest form. (1) 3112 x 118 (ii) 3/12 x 715 (iii) 318 x 15 (iv) 518 x 218​

Question

(7) Multiply and write the answer in the simplest form.
(1) 3112 x 118 (ii) 3/12 x 715
(iii) 318 x 15 (iv) 518 x 218​

in progress 0
Charlie 1 month 2021-08-23T00:00:59+00:00 2 Answers 0 views 0

Answers ( )

    0
    2021-08-23T00:02:11+00:00

    i 56010

    ii 178.75

    iii 4770

    iv 112924

    0
    2021-08-23T00:02:40+00:00

    ANSWER:

    (1) 367,216

    (2) 178.75

    (3) 4770

    (4) 112,924

Leave an answer

Browse
Browse

18:9+8+9*3-7:3-1*13 = ? ( )